Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0323 / CH0312
    (SB0613 / CH0311)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient ChargeFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1409 / CH0456Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of AnnapolisAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0613 / CH0311
    (HB0323 / CH0312)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient ChargeSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.