Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0278
    (SB0415)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0601
    (SB0466)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - RateFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1227 / CH0216
    (SB0499 / CH0215)
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League FeesDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1407Economic Development - Business Improvement DistrictsDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0415
    (HB0278)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0466
    (HB0601)
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - RateSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0499 / CH0215
    (HB1227 / CH0216)
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League FeesSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.