Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0386 / CH0444Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0431 / CH0119
    (SB0297 / CH0120)
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local ProvisionsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0624
    (SB0506)
Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural TourismDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1030
    (SB0846)
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and OperationsDelegate AndersonIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1181Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1286Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal CorporationsDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1650Harford County - Hotel Rental TaxDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0297 / CH0120
    (HB0431 / CH0119)
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local ProvisionsSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0506
    (HB0624)
Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural TourismSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0846
    (HB1030)
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and OperationsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Returned PassedBudget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 11:02 A.M.