Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0549Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal CorporationsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0824Admissions and Amusement Tax – Baltimore County – Fees for Nonprofit Amateur Sports LeagueDelegate WestIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1409Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)Delegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1624
    (SB0764 / CH0472)
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - AmountsDelegate AndertonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
SB0764 / CH0472
    (HB1624)
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - AmountsSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1192Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - AuthorizationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1225Anne Arundel County - Short-Term Residential Rentals - Taxation and RegulationSenator AstleIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:23 P.M.