Transportation - Highways (R1)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0304
    (SB0326)
Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses AuthorizedDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0593
    (SB0298)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Allegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0760Maryland Transportation Authority - Privatization of the Intercounty Connector and the I-95 Express Toll LanesDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0761State Highway Administration - Privatization of Rest Areas and Welcome Centers on State HighwaysDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0762State Highway Administration - Sale of Naming Rights to State HighwaysDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1046Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1508Montgomery County - Highway Construction and Maintenance - Maryland Route 410 in Takoma ParkDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0015Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - U.S. Route 15Senator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0093Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third SpanSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
1/23/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0132Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue AccountSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0298
    (HB0593)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Senator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0326
    (HB0304)
Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses AuthorizedSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0805Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming RightsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0842State Highway and Road Construction - Forward-Funded Projects - Reimbursement of Political SubdivisionsSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
SB1048Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil PenaltiesSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.