Transportation - Highways (R1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0247Vehicle Laws - Road Rage Reduction Act of 2014Delegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0252
    (SB0158)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Delegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0389 / CH0397
    (SB0730)
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - StudyDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0852Highways - Scenic Byways - SignsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0873
    (SB1001)
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Speed Limits and CrosswalksDelegate ConwayIn the Senate - Senate Refuses to RecedeEnvironmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0878 / CH0430
    (SB0814)
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - SpecificationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
HB0911
    (SB0677)
Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers RequiredDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0980Transportation - Roadway Near High Voltage Electric Transmission Line in Prince George's County - Limitation PG 407-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
HB1061Transportation - Interstate 95 Link to Roadways or Property Near the University of Maryland, College Park - Spending Prohibited PG 406-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
HB1177Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time LimitationsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1263Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1454Winter Driving Safety ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0158
    (HB0252)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68Senator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0677
    (HB0911)
Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers RequiredSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0697Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - ProceduresSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0730
    (HB0389 / CH0397)
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - StudySenator JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0814
    (HB0878 / CH0430)
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - SpecificationSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0928Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll PlazasSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0941Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses AuthorizedSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1001
    (HB0873)
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - CrosswalksSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.