Transportation - Highways (R1)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0015Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0214Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount PlansDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0286 / CH0083Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - SignsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 83Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0450
    (SB0371 / CH0028)
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority AreasDelegate CarrVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Delegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0484
    (SB0591)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0545State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk ClosureDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0621
    (SB0656)
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit ProcessDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0639
    (SB0377)
Maryland Transportation Authority - MembershipDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0747Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Multiple Axle Vehicles - Toll RatesCecil County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0762State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit ProcessDelegate BuckelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0920State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of CostsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1152Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1153State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public LibrariesDelegate ProctorIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1202Highway Construction and Maintenance - Use of Recycled AggregateDelegate BeidleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0275Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for CommutersSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0371 / CH0028
    (HB0450)
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority AreasSenator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 28Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0377
    (HB0639)
Maryland Transportation Authority - MembershipSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0591
    (HB0484)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0656
    (HB0621)
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit ProcessSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0682Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With VirginiaSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0802 / CH0052
    (HB0466 / CH0053)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Senator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.