Transportation - Highways (R1)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0004 / CH0020Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton BridgeDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0009 / CH0278Transportation - Dedication of StructuresDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0054
    (SB0024 / CH0223)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersDelegate LamIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0377Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0535 / CH0721
    (SB0407 / CH0722)
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - EstablishmentDelegate LiermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 721Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0560
    (SB0034)
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - RepealDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0744 / CH0717
    (SB0850 / CH0718)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 717Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0807 / CH0330
    (SB0516 / CH0331)
Transportation – Highway User Revenues – DistributionDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0977State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification ActDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1199Northern Bay CrossingDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1281State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public AccessDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
HB1332Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter PlanDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
HB1350 / CH0628
    (SB1006 / CH0629)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1356Highways – Maryland Route 208 – JurisdictionDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
HB1380State Highway Administration - Access to State Highways - Consideration of Pedestrian, Bicycle, and Public Transportation ActivityDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
HB1569
    (SB0901)
Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland ActDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0024 / CH0223
    (HB0054)
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0034
    (HB0560)
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - RepealSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0407 / CH0722
    (HB0535 / CH0721)
Transportation - Complete Streets Program - EstablishmentSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 722Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0516 / CH0331
    (HB0807 / CH0330)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - DistributionSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0850 / CH0718
    (HB0744 / CH0717)
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - AdoptionSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 718Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0901
    (HB1569)
Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland ActSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0906Construction of a Highway or County Road - Commercial Property - Access RoadsSenator WaughIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0935Maryland Transportation Authority - Broening Highway/Authority Drive Toll Facility - BypassSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1006 / CH0629
    (HB1350 / CH0628)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:35 A.M.