Transportation - Generally (R2)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0288 / CH0393Transportation - Metropolitan Planning Organizations - Notice and Public HearingDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Environmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0585
    (SB0082)
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildDelegate BarnesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0634
    (SB0185)
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life-Cycle Cost AnalysisDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0636 / CH0605Maryland Transit Administration - Commuter Benefits ProgramDelegate AroraApproved by the Governor - Chapter 605Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0725
    (SB0883)
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other RightsDelegate BarnesIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0917Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation CompaniesDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1059 / CH0638Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Local Government ReportingDelegate ClagettApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1067
    (SB0664)
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1123Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014Delegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1331
    (SB0765)
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1382Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Increases - Legislative Approval RequiredDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1427Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's CountyDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1442Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB1491 / CH0657Transportation - Citizens' Advisory Council for the Baltimore Corridor Transit Study - Red LineDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 657Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0082
    (HB0585)
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0185
    (HB0634)
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life-Cycle Cost AnalysisSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
SB0239Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0629Counties and Municipalities - Vehicle Registration Fee SurchargeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0664
    (HB1067)
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0765
    (HB1331)
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0772Transit Benefit DistrictsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
SB0788Income Tax Credit - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment - Retail Service Station DealersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0883
    (HB0725)
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other RightsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0885State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - ParticipationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0900Department of Transportation - Highway Needs Inventory - Four-Lane HighwaysSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0902Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and PaymentSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1035Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line ExtensionSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.