Transportation - Generally (R2)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0238Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air NavigationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0300 / CH0238Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization StudyDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0357Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0408Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Account Maintenance Charge - ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0546Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning BoardDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0639
    (SB0377)
Maryland Transportation Authority - MembershipDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0837Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0866Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral CommunicationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0913 / CH0286Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Local Government Reporting - RevisionsDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 286Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1127Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate OaksIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0181Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0377
    (HB0639)
Maryland Transportation Authority - MembershipSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0379Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge AuthoritySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0600 / CH0370Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - FundingSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0800Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.