Transportation - Generally (R2)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0233 / CH0154
    (SB0072 / CH0153)
Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - MembershipDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0240Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll RatesDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0333Commission to Study the Employment of Ethnic Minorities and Women Under Procurement Contracts at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
HB0503 / CH0268Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal MembersChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0891
    (SB1035)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1010Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning BoardDelegate LiermanVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1011Department of Transportation - Modal Administrations - AppointmentsDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1012 / CH0289Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit AmountDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1023
    (SB0966)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of FrederickDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1026Maryland Transit Administration - Fares - Calculation and Public CommentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1338Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 CorridorDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1382Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1388Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1434Rail Safety Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1439Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1455Transportation - Highway User Revenue - RestorationDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1486Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0056Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and PaymentSenator MathiasIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0072 / CH0153
    (HB0233 / CH0154)
Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - MembershipSenator DeGrangeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0119 / CH0350Business Regulation - Business Discounts and Preferences for Veterans - IdentificationSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Finance
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0199Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0500Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge AuthoritySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0596Transportation - Installation of Brick Security Mailboxes Within Rights-of-WaySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0654Maryland Transportation Authority - MembershipSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0966
    (HB1023)
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of FrederickSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1035
    (HB0891)
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery RateSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB1124Scrap Metal Processor - Purchase of Scrap Metal - Hours of OperationSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.