Transportation - Generally (R2)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0082 / CH0681
    (SB0125 / CH0682)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0119 / CH0003Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and CompactChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0149 / CH0112Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight AuthorityChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0271 / CH0024
    (SB0484 / CH0016)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0285 / CH0352
    (SB0265 / CH0351)
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0552Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local ShareDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0585
    (SB1114)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceDelegate CarozzaIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0874 / CH0464Air Navigation Protection From Hazards Act of 2017Delegate CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0907
    (SB0850)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1050
    (SB1065)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1132
    (SB1149 / CH0785)
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1360
    (SB0449 / CH0663)
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee ExemptionDelegate HixsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1568 / CH0336Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 415-17Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1651Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Ridership of Executive Branch Employees - Fare RequiredDelegate BarveIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0125 / CH0682
    (HB0082 / CH0681)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 682Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0161Transportation - Highway User Revenues - AllocationSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0265 / CH0351
    (HB0285 / CH0352)
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0449 / CH0663
    (HB1360)
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee ExemptionSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 663Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0484 / CH0016
    (HB0271 / CH0024)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0850
    (HB0907)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0963Transportation - Transit Service - State GrantsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1065
    (HB1050)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1114
    (HB0585)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1149 / CH0785
    (HB1132)
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School StudentsSenator OaksEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 785Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1164Maryland Transportation Authority - MembershipSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.