Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0032Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0150Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)Delegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
HB0430 / CH0371Criminal Law - Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption and Possession in Motor VehiclesChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0627
    (SB0850)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0765
    (SB0959)
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - TestimonyDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0987Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk DriversDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1336Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1490Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - ProhibitionDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0292Vehicle Laws - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Suspension Modification and Restrictive LicensesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0850
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0959
    (HB0765)
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - TestimonySenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.