Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0733Drunk Driving - State Officials - Mandatory Minimum SentenceDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0957 / CH0244
    (SB0710)
Impaired Driving - Repeat Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1014Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - EvidenceDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1015 / CH0631Drunk Driving - Transporting a Minor - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate AroraApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1286
    (SB0777)
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0087 / CH0017Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat OffendersChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 17Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0094Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0213Drunk Driving - Mandatory Participation in Educational ProgramSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0710
    (HB0957 / CH0244)
Impaired Driving - Repeat Offenders - PenaltiesSenator ForehandIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0777
    (HB1286)
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.