Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0047Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0157 / CH0518Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0182Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0630Drunk and Drugged Driving - Reinstatement of Revoked LicenseDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0735
    (SB0763)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0773 / CH0630
    (SB1008)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood TestDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 630Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0864
    (SB0302)
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0974Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's LicenseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1306Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle ForfeitureDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1342
    (SB0945 / CH0512)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Delegate KramerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1364
    (SB1039)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1367
    (SB0970)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1393Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving - Mandatory Minimum SentencesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0152Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for IntoxicationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0160 / CH0517Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0302
    (HB0864)
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0763
    (HB0735)
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or VesselSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0945 / CH0512
    (HB1342)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Senator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0970
    (HB1367)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1008
    (HB0773 / CH0630)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood TestSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1039
    (HB1364)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.