Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0371
    (SB0312)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)SpeakerIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0393Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - PenaltiesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0489Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0757Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System RequirementDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0784
    (SB0523)
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1068
    (SB0972)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1105Driving While Impaired By Alcohol - PenaltiesDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1151Habitual Drunk Drivers - Mandatory Minimum PenaltyDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1490Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0312
    (HB0371)
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders and Punitive Damages (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2017)PresidentIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0523
    (HB0784)
Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0692Drug or Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - RequirementsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0972
    (HB1068)
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot ProgramSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0974Vehicle Laws - Driving With Detectable Levels of a Controlled Dangerous Substance or Its Metabolites - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1058Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

April 10, 2017 11:25 P.M.