Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0077Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0088
    (SB0281)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0095Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0205Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - DefinitionDelegate Kelly, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0290Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With DealersDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0320Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0327Vehicle Laws - Single Registration PlateDelegate ElliottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0386
    (SB0390 / CH0493)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0529
    (SB0813 / CH0343)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor DesignationDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0540Motor Vehicles - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Titling for NonresidentsDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0575
    (SB0221 / CH0146)
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized UseDelegate JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0682
    (SB0545)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB1120
    (SB0387)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1190Vehicle Laws - Licenses and Registrations - Notice of Suspension or RevocationDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1275
    (SB0687 / CH0326)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With DealersDelegate FrushVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1286
    (SB0777)
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1290Vehicle Laws - Registration - Historic Motor VehiclesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1339
    (SB0807)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Defining and ReportingDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1345 / CH0360
    (SB0908 / CH0359)
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax CreditsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Environmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.Finance
HB1421Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional PermitsDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1423Vehicle Laws - Motorcycles - Learners' Instructional PermitsDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1553Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Camping TrailersDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0004Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Appalachian TrailSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0026 / CH0005Motor Vehicles - Commercial Instructional Permit Holders - Administrative Penalties and ProceduresChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0221 / CH0146
    (HB0575)
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized UseSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0241Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Driver Education and PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0281
    (HB0088)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0378 / CH0294Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - DefinitionSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0387
    (HB1120)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0390 / CH0493
    (HB0386)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsBaltimore City SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0545
    (HB0682)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0687 / CH0326
    (HB1275)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With DealersSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 326Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0773Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the RoadSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0777
    (HB1286)
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving OffensesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB0807
    (HB1339)
Drivers' Licenses - Disorder, Disease, or Physical Disability - Identification, Disclosure, and ReportingSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0813 / CH0343
    (HB0529)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Organ Donor DesignationSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0908 / CH0359
    (HB1345 / CH0360)
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax CreditsSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.