Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0061Vehicle Laws - Single Registration PlateDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0062Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0196
    (SB0072)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0201 / CH0076Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical TherapistsDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0203 / CH0078Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental VehiclesDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0235 / CH0231Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Distributors - Sale of Electric or Nonfossil-Fuel Burning VehiclesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0313 / CH0157
    (SB0298 / CH0156)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing AgreementsDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Environment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0524 / CH0257Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0568
    (SB0587)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory BranchesDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0592
    (SB0415 / CH0348)
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)Delegate MorhaimVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0630 / CH0444Mechanical Repair Contracts - RequirementsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0632Prince George's County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Penalty for Highway Use PG 312-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0811
    (SB0782)
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Minimum AgeDelegate HornbergerIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0833
    (SB0558)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With DealersDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0846 / CH0283
    (SB0671)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Commercial Driver's License - Program for Veterans and Service Members (Troops to Trucks)Delegate VogtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0891Voting Disclosure Act of 2015Delegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1048Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education - LicensingDelegate GilchristIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1203Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class S (Drivers' School) VehicleDelegate BeidleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1229 / CH0304Commercial Motor Vehicles - Denial, Cancellation, Suspension, or Revocation of RegistrationChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0072
    (HB0196)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0124Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical TherapistsSenator GladdenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0298 / CH0156
    (HB0313 / CH0157)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing AgreementsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0304Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Class L (Historic) VehiclesSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0380Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0415 / CH0348
    (HB0592)
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)Senator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0451Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental VehiclesSenator GuzzoneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0452Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation of Allergy or Medical ConditionSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0462Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Definition and RequirementsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0522Vehicle Laws - Registration - Outstanding Arrest WarrantsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0558
    (HB0833)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship With DealersSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0587
    (HB0568)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory BranchesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB0671
    (HB0846 / CH0283)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Commercial Driver's License - Program for Veterans and Service Members (Troops to Trucks)Senator YoungVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0782
    (HB0811)
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Minimum AgeSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0787Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0932Drivers' Licenses - Notation of Veteran Status - NoticeSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.