Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0194
    (SB0044 / CH0320)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysDelegate BeitzelVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0271Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Quarterly AuditsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0393Crimes - Use or Possession of Marijuana in a Motor Vehicle - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0410Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Application to Right TurnsDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0471School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil PenaltyDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0476Motor Vehicles - Wearable Computer With Head-Mounted Display - ProhibitedDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0493 / CH0252Motor Vehicles - Prohibition Against Unattended Motor Vehicle - ExceptionsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0506
    (SB0410 / CH0168)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetyDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0539State Highway Administration - Evaluation of Urban Highways - Classifications and Speed LimitsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0588
    (SB0547)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0609Prince George's County - Motorcycle Operators - Penalties for Speed Violations PG 311-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0632Prince George's County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Penalty for Highway Use PG 312-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0653Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulation of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles MC/PG 114-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0654Prince George's County - Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception to Prohibition PG 313-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0808
    (SB0098)
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Service VehicleDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0814Vehicle Laws - Intercounty Connector - Maximum Speed LimitDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0818Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane ChangesDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1025School Vehicles - Right Turn on Red - ProhibitionDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1038Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1086
    (SB0132)
Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Designees - Hearing and ApprovalDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1099Motor Vehicles - Aggressive DrivingDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0044 / CH0320
    (HB0194)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0084Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0098
    (HB0808)
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Service VehicleSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0132
    (HB1086)
Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Designees - ApprovalSenator BrochinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0316Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - EnforcementSenator RamirezIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0410 / CH0168
    (HB0506)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetySenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0517Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug ParaphernaliaSenator ZirkinVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0547
    (HB0588)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0612Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0790Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - PenaltiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.