Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0028
    (SB0443)
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and PenaltiesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0032
    (SB0442)
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted WindowsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0126
    (SB0723)
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed PublicationsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0205Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - DefinitionDelegate Kelly, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0246 / CH0091
    (SB0389)
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - ProceduresDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91Environmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0277Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
HB0666
    (SB0640)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0677Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Request for Exhaust Emissions Test After Failing On-Board Diagnostics TestDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0678Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning DevicesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1087Motor Vehicles - Prohibition Against Unattended Motor Vehicle - ExceptionDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1230Vehicle Laws - Signal Devices on Personal Vehicles - Fire PoliceDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1241Motor Vehicles - Use of Headlights When Windshield Wipers Operating - EnforcementDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1246 / CH0450
    (SB0771)
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - EstablishmentDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB0006 / CH0003Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance TechnicianChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0072 / CH0013Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load LimitsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 13Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0086 / CH0127Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load LimitsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0378 / CH0294Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - DefinitionSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0389
    (HB0246 / CH0091)
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - ProceduresSenator RobeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0442
    (HB0032)
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted WindowsSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0443
    (HB0028)
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and PenaltiesSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0640
    (HB0666)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0723
    (HB0126)
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed PublicationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0771
    (HB1246 / CH0450)
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - EstablishmentSenator RobeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.