Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0058 / CH0608Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and InspectionsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0229 / CH0256Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation EmergenciesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0294
    (SB0232)
Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers OperatingDelegate SteinIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0373Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary OffenseDelegate SteinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0479Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Seat BeltsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0482Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Recording EquipmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0486Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0547Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial InspectionDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0635Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Recall or Remediation - Documentation of RepairsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0662Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0698
    (SB0573)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - PoultryDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0805
    (SB0774 / CH0231)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsDelegate BeidleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0848Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - ProhibitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1236 / CH0457
    (SB0969 / CH0456)
Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - ProhibitionsDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Environment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB1356Motor Vehicles - Vehicle Event Data RecordersDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1473Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat BeltsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0125Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - ExemptionsSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0183School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0196Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0232
    (HB0294)
Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers OperatingSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0573
    (HB0698)
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State HighwaysSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0635Vehicle Laws - Flashing Lights - Community-Based Emergency Response VehiclesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0774 / CH0231
    (HB0805)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0969 / CH0456
    (HB1236 / CH0457)
Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - ProhibitionsSenator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.