Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0122 / CH0670Motor Vehicles - Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Sunset ExtensionChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0341Maryland Student Transportation Safety ActDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0494 / CH0749
    (SB0086 / CH0750)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - RepealDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 749Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0783Vehicle Equipment - Driver Alcohol Detection System for Safety ProgramDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0940
    (SB0987)
Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt RequirementDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0952 / CH0753
    (SB0707 / CH0752)
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)Delegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 753Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1000Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1035 / CH0077
    (SB0558 / CH0076)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling PermitDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1285Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary OffenseDelegate SteinIn the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Beidle)Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1479
    (SB1050)
Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight LimitsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0009Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected VehiclesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0034 / CH0344Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise TaxChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0086 / CH0750
    (HB0494 / CH0749)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Fog Lights When Windshield Wipers Operating - RepealSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 750Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0155School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0277Motor Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of RegistrationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0284Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0558 / CH0076
    (HB1035 / CH0077)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling PermitSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0668 / CH0751Vehicle Laws - Operation of Motorcycles - Handlebar HeightSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 751Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0707 / CH0752
    (HB0952 / CH0753)
Vehicle Law - Waste and Recycling Collection Vehicles - Use of Yellow and Amber Lights (The Senator Bob Hooper Sanitation Safety Act)Senator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0917 / CH0353
    (HB0768)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0987
    (HB0940)
Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt RequirementSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1050
    (HB1479)
Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight LimitsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.