Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0016Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Dirt BikesDelegate GlennIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/28/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0172
    (SB0778)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0288Vehicle Laws - Regulation of Parking - JurisdictionDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0292Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York RoadBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0339
    (SB0413 / CH0127)
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting RequirementsDelegate CarterVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0717Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating VehicleDelegate KramerIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0812 / CH0281Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to FarmsDelegate HornbergerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Environment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1078
    (SB0559)
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet LocationsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1130Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - PenaltiesDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1241 / CH0122Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related FeesChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1269
    (SB0917)
Maryland Salvage Advertising ActDelegate BeidleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0413 / CH0127
    (HB0339)
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting RequirementsSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0559
    (HB1078)
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet LocationsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0682Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With VirginiaSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0714 / CH0378Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting and Sunset ExtensionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 378Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0778
    (HB0172)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0917
    (HB1269)
Maryland Salvage Advertising ActSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.