Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0005 / CH0020
    (SB0403)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Economic Matters
1/18/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0023
    (SB0341)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0024Natural Resources - Forest, Park, and Wildlife Rangers - Parking CitationsDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0031Motor Vehicle Administration - Public Records Inspections - Young PersonsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0051Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - DefinitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0411
    (SB0418)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0585
    (SB1114)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceDelegate CarozzaIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0603 / CH0345Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0627Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response TripsDelegate Howard, C.In the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1071Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension HearingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Passed EnrolledJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1079Roadways - Crossing by Pedestrians of Roadways - Authority of Local JurisdictionsDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1359Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication and Text-Messaging Devices While Driving - Enforcement - StudyDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1385
    (SB0961)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - SecurityDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1434Business Regulation - Marina Fuel Sales - Fuel SalesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1520
    (SB1056)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0009Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected VehiclesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0025Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab ServiceChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0136Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political SubdivisionsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0155School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0165 / CH0055Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - PenaltiesPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0341
    (HB0023)
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - DefinitionSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0403
    (HB0005 / CH0020)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0418
    (HB0411)
State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Installation at Large Continuing Care Retirement CommunitiesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0961
    (HB1385)
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - SecuritySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1056
    (HB1520)
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1114
    (HB0585)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2017 12:13 P.M.