Environment and Transportation

2016 Regular Session

Weekly Schedule - Published August 25, 2016


ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
Delegate Kumar P. Barve, Chair
Delegate Dana Stein, Vice Chair


FULL COMMITTEE


 

tuesday august 30, 2016


                                  11:00 A.M.     Garrett College
                                                 Auditorium
                                                 687 Mosser Road
                                                 McHenry, MD

  NOTE:  The maximum seating capacity at Garrett College Auditorium
  is 300 seats. Anyone wishing to speak at the public forum must sign the
  participant register before the public forum begins. Oral remarks will be
  limited in time. A time limit will be determined based on the number of people
  who sign the participant register and to accommodate as many people as
  possible. The participant register is available for anyone who wants to record
  a position. The committee welcomes the submission of written remarks on the
  topic via mail, email, or fax.

    Subject:  11:00 A.M. - 12:30 P.M. Work Session with group generally
              supportive of Hydraulic Fracturing Activities

              2:00 P.M. - 3:30 P.M. Work Session with group generally opposed
              to, or concerned about, Hydraulic Fracturing Activities

              6:30 P.M. - 8:30 P.M. - Public Forum on Hydraulic Fracturing


 

wednesday august 31, 2016


                                  9:00 A.M.

  NOTE:  Subject Change

    Subject:  Site Visit to Garrett County


 

thursday september 15, 2016


                                  9:00 A.M.


    Subject:  Site Visit with Maryland Port Administration to Poplar Island


 

wednesday september 21, 2016


                                  10:00 A.M.


    Subject:  Site Visit to the Maryland Port Administration's Dundalk and
              Seagirt Terminals and the National Aquarium


  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Laura Lodge, Patrick Tracy, and Cristen
      Flynn, Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350
                         301-970-5350

Top


HOUSE ENVIRONMENT AND TRANSPORTATION - HOUSING AND REAL PROPERTY SUBCOMMITTEE
Delegate Marvin E. Holmes, Jr., Chair


 

wednesday september 7, 2016


                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 250
                                                 Environment and Transportation
                                                 Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Full Day Work Session on Residential Foreclosures


 

tuesday september 13, 2016


                                  10:00 A.M.     Room 250
                                                 Environment and Transportation
                                                 Committee
                                                 House Office Building
                                                 6 Bladen Street
                                                 Annapolis, MD

    Subject:  Full Day Work Session on Lead Poisoning


  FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, CONTACT:  Laura P. Lodge (Residential Foreclosures)
      or Cristen Flynn (Lead Poisoning), Dept. of Legislative Services
              Telephone: 410-946-5350
                         301-970-5350

August 25, 2016 11:47 A.M.