Contact Rules

For questions requiring an immediate response please call the committee.
Please check the committee guidelines for answers to common questions. Witness Guidelines and Committee FAQs
Javascript must be enabled on your browser to use this feature. Click 'Close' to continue.

Rules

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0183 / CH0044Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0184 / CH0045Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0951
    (HB0986)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe HouseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0959
    (HB0499)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Interfaith Works Resource VillageSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0963
    (HB0284)
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact AnalysisSenator ColburnIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Agriculture (M4)
SB0970
    (HB1223)
Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement ProgramSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0972
    (HB1318)
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination ExtensionSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0979
    (HB0729)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0986
    (HB1273)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0989
    (HB1224)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding ArbitrationSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0991
    (HB0422)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedSenator KingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0994
    (HB1058)
Baltimore City - School Closures - ConsultationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB1000Historically Black Colleges and Universities - International EducationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Higher Education (F2)
SB1018
    (HB0577)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesSenator ReillyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Children (O4)
SB1021Net Energy Metering - Industrial Combined Heat and PowerSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1023
    (HB1445)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional OfficersSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB1037
    (HB1444)
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery OrganizationSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules Family Law (D4)
SB1039
    (HB1194)
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Parity and InvestmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Higher Education (F2)
SB1058
    (HB1452)
Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - RegulationSenator AstleIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Gaming (C7)
SB1065
    (HB0856 / CH0259)
Task Force on Community Health WorkersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Health Occupations (J2)
SB1080
    (HB1426)
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an OrganizationSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Horse Racing (C6)
SB1084Baltimore County - Stormwater Remediation Fee - Application and LimitationBaltimore County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.Rules Environment (M3)
SB1088
    (HB0355 / CH0223)
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide VictimsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1092Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw MilkSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.Rules Public Health (J1)
SB1093State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1107
    (HB1522 / CH0461)
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary RelocationSenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Children (O4)
SB1115Members of the General Assembly - Responsibilities and Eligibility to VoteSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1116Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SJ0008
    (HJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Financial Institutions (I1)
SJ0009
    (HJ0009)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - RecommendationsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0262
    (SB0231 / CH0476)
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionDelegate BeitzelIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0412
    (SB0229)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on FeesDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB1021Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB1135
    (SB0899 / CH0573)
Kent County - Gaming - PermitsDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1136Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grants - Schedule and Reporting Requirements for Baltimore CityDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Gaming (C7)
HB1197
    (SB0409)
Health - Food Allergy AwarenessDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Public Health (J1)
HB1198
    (SB0779)
Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process HearingsDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1389Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate McComasIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 10, 2014 7:19 P.M.