Rules

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0222 / CH0021Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0223 / CH0022Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0478
    (HB0678)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0713
    (HB0989)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0751Washington County - Board of Education - Financing AuthorityWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0754Election Law - Campaign Finance Reports - Filing DeadlinesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesElections (G1)
SB0760Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Combustion SourceSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0765Video Lottery Facilities - Table Games - Distribution of ProceedsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesGaming (C7)
SB0815Anne Arundel County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0836General Assembly - Name Submitted by Central Committee to Fill Vacancy - Required Appointment by GovernorSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0841
    (HB0069)
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionSenator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0842
    (HB0184)
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionSenator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0879
    (HB0583)
Open Meetings Act - Requirements for Providing AgendasSenator BatesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0892Environment - Nitrogen Oxide Emissions - Pollution and Combustion Control TechnologiesSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEnvironment (M3)
SB0900Public Health - Abortions - Physician RequirementsSenator WaughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB0901Standardbred Racing - Purse Deductions and Operating Assistance to Rosecroft RacewaySenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesGaming (C7)
SB0918
    (HB1044)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Family Life and Wellness Intergenerational CenterSenator PetersIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0932Drivers' Licenses - Notation of Veteran Status - NoticeSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0094
    (SB0051 / CH0145)
Commission on African American History and Culture - DutiesDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0257
    (SB0702 / CH0048)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal SystemBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0322Harford County - Charitable GamingHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesGaming (C7)
HB0686Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundDelegate Wilson, C.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1152Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit ProgramAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTransportation - Highways (R1)
HJ0002
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Democracy AmendmentDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:43 P.M.