Rules

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0493 / CH0061Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0494 / CH0062Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1079
    (HB1536)
State Board of Physicians - Athletic Trainers - Scope of PracticeSenator BatesIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1116
    (HB1614)
Maryland Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1133
    (HB0532)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentitySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesElections (G1)
SB1136
    (HB1179)
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney - Annual SalarySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB1139
    (HB1624)
University of Maryland Eastern Shore - State Matching Funds for Land-Grant InstitutionsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesHigher Education (F2)
SB1145
    (HB1615)
Maryland Fair Scheduling ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1163
    (HB0244)
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of RobberySenator PetersIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1180Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - RepealSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Safety (E4)
HB0071
    (SB0210)
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Brewery License Holders - Food ServiceDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0240
    (SB0200)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsDelegate WalkerIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1494
    (SB0459)
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, C.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
RulesInsurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2017 4:38 P.M.