Rules

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 38

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0183 / CH0044Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0184 / CH0045Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0951
    (HB0986)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe HouseSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0959
    (HB0499)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Interfaith Works Resource VillageSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0963
    (HB0284)
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact AnalysisSenator ColburnIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Agriculture (M4)
SB0970
    (HB1223)
Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement ProgramSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0972
    (HB1318)
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination ExtensionSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0979
    (HB0729)
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0986
    (HB1273)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0989
    (HB1224)
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding ArbitrationSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0991
    (HB0422)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedSenator KingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0994
    (HB1058)
Baltimore City - School Closures - ConsultationsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB1000Historically Black Colleges and Universities - International EducationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Higher Education (F2)
SB1018
    (HB0577)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesSenator ReillyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Children (O4)
SB1021Net Energy Metering - Industrial Combined Heat and PowerSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1023
    (HB1445)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional OfficersSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB1037
    (HB1444)
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery OrganizationSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRules Family Law (D4)
SB1039
    (HB1194)
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Parity and InvestmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Higher Education (F2)
SB1058
    (HB1452)
Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - RegulationSenator AstleIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Gaming (C7)
SB1065
    (HB0856 / CH0259)
Task Force on Community Health WorkersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Health Occupations (J2)
SB1080
    (HB1426)
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an OrganizationSenator PughIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Horse Racing (C6)
SB1084Baltimore County - Stormwater Remediation Fee - Application and LimitationBaltimore County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.Rules Environment (M3)
SB1088
    (HB0355 / CH0223)
Criminal Procedure - Programs for Survivors of Homicide VictimsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1092Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw MilkSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.Rules Public Health (J1)
SB1093State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1107
    (HB1522 / CH0461)
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary RelocationSenator BensonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Children (O4)
SB1115Members of the General Assembly - Responsibilities and Eligibility to VoteSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1116Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SJ0008
    (HJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Financial Institutions (I1)
SJ0009
    (HJ0009)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - RecommendationsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0262
    (SB0231 / CH0476)
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for ProtectionDelegate BeitzelIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0412
    (SB0229)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on FeesDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB1021Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB1135
    (SB0899 / CH0573)
Kent County - Gaming - PermitsDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1136Video Lottery Terminals - Local Impact Grants - Schedule and Reporting Requirements for Baltimore CityDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Gaming (C7)
HB1197
    (SB0409)
Health - Food Allergy AwarenessDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Public Health (J1)
HB1198
    (SB0779)
Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process HearingsDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1389Task Force on the Prevention of Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate McComasIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 10, 2014 7:19 P.M.