Abandoned Property

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0235Abandoned Private Cemeteries - Repair or Maintenance by County or MunicipalityDelegate KnottsIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0659 / CH0615
    (SB0823 / CH0616)
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in MarylandDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0702
    (SB1033 / CH0617)
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureDelegate HolmesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0838
    (SB0487 / CH0595)
Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned PropertyDelegate McIntoshIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1168 / CH0618
    (SB0957 / CH0619)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1253 / CH0408State Boat Act - Removal of Abandoned or Sunken VesselsDelegate LongApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1257Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax RatePrince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1291
    (SB0856 / CH0839)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsDelegate Barnes, B.In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1437
    (SB1184)
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular AssessmentsDelegate ProctorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1567Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Release of Liens on Vacant Property PG 413-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1573 / CH0819Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 411-17Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Ways and Means
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0487 / CH0595
    (HB0838)
Baltimore City - Residential Ground Leases - Abandoned PropertySenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0803Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0823 / CH0616
    (HB0659 / CH0615)
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in MarylandSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0856 / CH0839
    (HB1291)
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property FundsSenator GuzzoneEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 839Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0957 / CH0619
    (HB1168 / CH0618)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and TransportationCounties - Generally (L1)
SB1033 / CH0617
    (HB0702)
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 617Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB1184
    (HB1437)
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular AssessmentsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.