Abortion

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1335Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian ConsentDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1355
    (SB1067)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1424Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0449Public Health - Abortions - ViabilitySenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0629 / CH0828
    (HB0787 / CH0827)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1067
    (HB1355)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.