Abuse

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0261Juvenile Causes - Disposition on Delinquency Petition - Required ConsiderationsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0265Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0279Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - ReportDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0512
    (SB0430)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0583
    (SB0283 / CH0546)
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of DogfightingDelegate LamIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1086Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of the Inspector General - Establishment PG 421-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1113 / CH0573
    (SB0663 / CH0572)
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)Delegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Economic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1220 / CH0136Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery ActivitiesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1262
    (SB0829)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1396
    (SB0960)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1586
    (SB0722)
Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory ReportingDelegate McConkeyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0059Criminal Law - Aggravated Cruelty to Animals in the Presence of a MinorSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0264Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False RepresentationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0283 / CH0546
    (HB0583)
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of DogfightingSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0430
    (HB0512)
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification RightsSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0472
    (HB0580)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0663 / CH0572
    (HB1113 / CH0573)
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)Senator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0722
    (HB1586)
Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory ReportingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0829
    (HB1262)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0960
    (HB1396)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.