Abuse

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0256Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period IncreaseDelegate CarozzaIn the Senate - Hearing canceledJudiciary
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0316
    (SB0428)
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - RequirementsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0455 / CH0188
    (SB0790 / CH0187)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - ApplicabilityDelegate AtterbearyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 188Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0501Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness EducationDelegate ChangIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0625
    (SB0080)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and RestitutionDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0803
    (SB0900)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0941
    (SB0631)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - EstablishmentDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Returned PassedAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1272Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1361Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Hunting ExemptionsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1463Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - ReportingDelegate FrushIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0080
    (HB0625)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and RestitutionSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0084Maryland Animal Abuse RegistrySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0240Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - ReportSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0428
    (HB0316)
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0444Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False RepresentationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0631
    (HB0941)
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - EstablishmentSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0680Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0790 / CH0187
    (HB0455 / CH0188)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - ApplicabilitySenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 187Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0900
    (HB0803)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Family Law (D4)
SB1030State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness CourseSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2017 12:11 P.M.