Accidents

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0150Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)Delegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0627
    (SB0850)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0764
    (SB0803)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - LimitationDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0954
    (SB0763)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0987Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk DriversDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1117Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital BenefitsDelegate DonoghueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1382Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Delegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1442Vehicular Accidents - Disclosure of Driver's Home Telephone Number Without Approval - ProhibitionDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0763
    (HB0954)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0803
    (HB0764)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - LimitationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0850
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0875Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0891Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's EstateSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.