Accidents

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0426Education - Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot ProgramDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0682
    (SB0545)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1160
    (SB0919)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1188Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - RequiredDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1212 / CH0248
    (SB0348 / CH0260)
Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - PenaltiesDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1454Winter Driving Safety ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0130 / CH0038Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic SharingChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0241Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Driver Education and PenaltiesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0348 / CH0260
    (HB1212 / CH0248)
Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - PenaltiesSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0456 / CH0169Insurance - Definition of Premium - Inclusion of Motor Vehicle Driving Record Report and Accident History Report FeesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 169Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0545
    (HB0682)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - ExpungementSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0919
    (HB1160)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - EstablishmentSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.