Accidents

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0008
    (SB0126)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0157 / CH0518Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0182Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol TestingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0246 / CH0576
    (SB0716 / CH0575)
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 576Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0667
    (SB0553)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0805
    (SB0774 / CH0231)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsDelegate BeidleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0857Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - RequiredDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1284
    (SB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle SurfacesDelegate PattersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1364
    (SB1039)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseDelegate SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1414Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)Delegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1506Natural Resources - Wildlife and HuntingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0126
    (HB0008)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0160 / CH0517Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - PenaltiesSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0199Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0553
    (HB0667)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0627
    (HB1284)
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle SurfacesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0716 / CH0575
    (HB0246 / CH0576)
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 575Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0774 / CH0231
    (HB0805)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1039
    (HB1364)
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance AbuseSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1073Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - PenaltiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.