Accountants

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0162Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection ActChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0553
    (SB0535)
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - RequirementsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1381Income Tax Preparers - Grant Program - Free Application for Federal Student AidDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1399
    (SB0910)
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - EstablishedDelegate HayesIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0535
    (HB0553)
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0910
    (HB1399)
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - EstablishedSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1059Baltimore City - Office of the Baltimore City Sheriff - Positions and Grievance ProceduresSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1112 / CH0320Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit ProgramPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.