Accountants

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0243 / CH0423
    (SB0394)
St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0726Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - RequirementsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0192Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0394
    (HB0243 / CH0423)
St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - RepealSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:01 P.M.