Acupuncturists

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0206
    (SB0237 / CH0211)
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1096 / CH0401
    (SB0672)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1115 / CH0404
    (SB0593)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilityDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1290
    (SB0837)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0237 / CH0211
    (HB0206)
Health Occupations - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0593
    (HB1115 / CH0404)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilitySenator MontgomeryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0672
    (HB1096 / CH0401)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0837
    (HB1290)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.