Administrative Hearings, Office of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0377
    (SB0513)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0410 / CH0664
    (SB0266 / CH0663)
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016Delegate O'DonnellEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0709 / CH0672
    (SB0422 / CH0671)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0778Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0855 / CH0555
    (SB0439 / CH0554)
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and ReinstatementDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0266 / CH0663
    (HB0410 / CH0664)
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016Senator SallingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0422 / CH0671
    (HB0709 / CH0672)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0439 / CH0554
    (HB0855 / CH0555)
Correctional Training Commission - Department of Juvenile Services Employees - Revocation of Certification and ReinstatementSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0513
    (HB0377)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.