Administrative Office of the Courts

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0197
    (SB0271)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0687 / CH0633Commission on Child Custody Decision MakingDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0887Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location PrivacyDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0271
    (HB0197)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - PenaltiesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.