Administrative Office of the Courts

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108
    (SB0032)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0386
    (SB0390 / CH0493)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0912 / CH0242
    (SB0924)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacyDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1161
    (SB0698 / CH0191)
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - OrderDelegate WaldstreicherVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1273
    (SB0986)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1292
    (SB0824)
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective BargainingDelegate JonesIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1328
    (SB0865 / CH0567)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsDelegate SwainIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
SB0032
    (HB0108)
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - FundingChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0390 / CH0493
    (HB0386)
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - PointsBaltimore City SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0698 / CH0191
    (HB1161)
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - OrderSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0824
    (HB1292)
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0865 / CH0567
    (HB1328)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0924
    (HB0912 / CH0242)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacySenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0986
    (HB1273)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.