Administrative Office of the Courts

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0220
    (SB0328)
Criminal Procedure - Partial ExpungementDelegate BarronIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0410 / CH0664
    (SB0266 / CH0663)
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016Delegate O'DonnellEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0814
    (SB0849)
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health CourtsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0266 / CH0663
    (HB0410 / CH0664)
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016Senator SallingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0327Natural Resources Police - Conditions of Sentencing, Probation, Parole, or Mandatory Release Supervision - DatabaseSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0849
    (HB0814)
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health CourtsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1106 / CH0467Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.