Administrative Office of the Courts

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0840Criminal Procedure - Partial ExpungementDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1082 / CH0573
    (SB1060 / CH0574)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Delegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 573Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1060 / CH0574
    (HB1082 / CH0573)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Senator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 1, 2017 9:04 A.M.