Adoption

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0178 / CH0086Family Law - Adoption, Search, Contact, and Reunion Services - Relatives of Minors in Out-of-Home PlacementChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0236
    (SB0208)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0689
    (SB0599)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care CenterAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0958
    (SB0411)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1026 / CH0334
    (SB0737 / CH0333)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1347
    (SB0862)
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and CatsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1358Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog AdoptionDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1474Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or CatsDelegate KachIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0208
    (HB0236)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0411
    (HB0958)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0599
    (HB0689)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care CenterSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0681Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0737 / CH0333
    (HB1026 / CH0334)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0862
    (HB1347)
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and CatsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0912Maryland Animal Abuse RegistrySenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1093State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal ServicesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.