Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0732
    (SB0675 / CH0236)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0775
    (SB0859 / CH0752)
State Employees - Parental LeaveDelegate KellyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0787 / CH0827
    (SB0629 / CH0828)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1425Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of ConsentDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1567Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog AdoptionDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
SB0060Family Law - Same-Sex Couples - Marital Presumption and Expedited Second Parent AdoptionSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0629 / CH0828
    (HB0787 / CH0827)
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical CareSenator KelleyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0675 / CH0236
    (HB0732)
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018Senator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0859 / CH0752
    (HB0775)
State Employees – Parental LeaveSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:00 P.M.