AELR Committee

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0775
    (HB0939 / CH0137)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.