Age of Majority

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0085 / CH0474Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0350Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0409Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing ActDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0642 / CH0012
    (SB0505)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsDelegate Wilson, C.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0955Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of CourtDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1236
    (SB0891)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1445
    (SB0775)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop LicensesDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1555Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - ServiceDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0775
    (HB1445)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist LicenseHarford County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0891
    (HB1236)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and CultivateSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0913 / CH0277
    (HB1122 / CH0278)
State Retirement and Pension System - Death BenefitsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Budget and Taxation
3/2/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1006Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationSenator JenningsIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:42 P.M.