Age of Majority

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0143Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0178 / CH0125Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0191
    (SB0670)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0466Baltimore City - Ammunition Sales - Record KeepingDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0827
    (SB0669)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0856 / CH0612
    (SB0647 / CH0611)
Earned Income Tax Credit – Individuals Without Qualifying Children – Repeal of Minimum Age RequirementDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0868
    (SB0992)
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0966
    (SB1103)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1152
    (SB0965)
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of CourtDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1264
    (SB1039)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and SaleDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1346Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and ImplementationDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1473 / CH0527Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0043 / CH0373
    (HB0193 / CH0374)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0439Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0669
    (HB0827)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0670
    (HB0191)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsSenator ZirkinIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0965
    (HB1152)
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of CourtSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0992
    (HB0868)
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1039
    (HB1264)
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and SaleSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1103
    (HB0966)
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate ProgramSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.