Agents and Brokers

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0040Residential Property Sales - Disclosure of Utility ConsumptionDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (23-23)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0088
    (SB0199 / CH0205)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0400
    (SB0364)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0509Maryland False Claims Act of 2013Delegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0537 / CH0377Insurance Producers - Continuing Education - Online CoursesDelegate SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0724 / CH0385Insurance - Risk Based Capital Standards - Fraternal Benefit Societies and Life InsurersChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 385Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0785
    (SB0375 / CH0247)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeDelegate Washington, A.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0881Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0887Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Location PrivacyDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0978 / CH0396Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival PermitDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1011
    (SB0682 / CH0525)
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Employees of Vendor, Disclosures to Customers, and StudyDelegate JamesonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1135
    (SB0687)
Limited Lines - Travel InsuranceDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1252 / CH0291
    (SB0582 / CH0290)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and StandardsDelegate Kelly, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1354Real Property - Disclosure Requirements - Death by Other Than Natural CausesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1368Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1375Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor VehiclesDelegate FisherIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1487Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales PresumptionDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1519
    (SB0735)
Insurance - Premium FinancingDelegate DonoghueIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0028Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0199 / CH0205
    (HB0088)
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior LiensSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0306Business Regulation - Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers - Exemptions for Consignment Shop OperatorsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0364
    (HB0400)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0375 / CH0247
    (HB0785)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 247Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0487
    (HB0603)
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of IncomeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0582 / CH0290
    (HB1252 / CH0291)
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Utilization Review Criteria and StandardsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0682 / CH0525
    (HB1011)
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Employees of Vendor, Disclosures to Customers, and StudySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0687
    (HB1135)
Limited Lines - Travel InsuranceSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0735
    (HB1519)
Insurance - Premium FinancingSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0780Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage AgentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.